NC H1322 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Held by Senate
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Held by Senate
Summary
Probationary Teacher Appeals.
Title
Probationary Teacher Appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Held by Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-12 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S962 (Same As) 2009-07-24 - Ch. SL 2009-326
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1322 |