NC H1305 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-472
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-472
Summary
Beach Plan Changes.
Title
Beach Plan Changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-472 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Failed #3 | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-23 | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-07-16 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2009-07-13 | Placed On Cal For 7/14/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-13 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1305 |