NC H1281 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Summary
Election Director Oversight.
Title
Election Director Oversight.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed On Cal For 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1281 |