NC H1280 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-489
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-489
Summary
Clarifying Changes/Work First Program.
Title
Clarifying Changes/Work First Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Beverly Earle [D] | Rep. Julia Howard [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Sen. Earline Parmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-489 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Ratified | |
2009-08-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-07-23 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-07-22 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-21 | Placed On Cal For 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-08 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | |
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1280 |