NC H128 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Failed Concur In S Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Reemploy NC's Workforce

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Reemploy NC's Workforce

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2021-06-09HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-06-09HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-06-03HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-06-03HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-06-02SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-06-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-01SenateAmend Tabled A2
2021-06-01SenateAmend Tabled A1
2021-05-28SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-20SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-03SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-03-03HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-03-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-03HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-24HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9614.11(n/a)Citation Text
9614.9(n/a)Citation Text
9640(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H128
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H128v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H128v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H128v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H128v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/864/0/H128-PCS40130-TC-4
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51927/0/H128-PCS30431-BHa-19
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51949/0/H128-ABHXFR-27-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51952/0/H128-ABH-24-V-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H128-SMTC-9(CSTC-4)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H128-SMTC-12(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H128-SMBH-38(CSBHa-19)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H128-SMBH-40(e3)-v-3
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/15
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/240
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/239
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/238
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/379

Bill Comments 750

feedback