NC H125 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public Agency Computer Code Not Public Record
Title
Public Agency Computer Code Not Public Record
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Edward Hanes [D] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] |
Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Ch. SL 2013-96 | |
2013-06-12 | Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013 | |
2013-06-07 | Pres. To Gov. 6/7/2013 | |
2013-06-06 | Ratified | |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-20 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S295 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I