NC H1247 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Ch. SL 2014-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Ch. SL 2014-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Asheville Regional Airport
Title
Asheville Regional Airport
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McGrady [R] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Nathan Ramsey [R] |
Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Ch. SL 2014-52 | |
2014-07-02 | Ratified | |
2014-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-01 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-06-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2014 |
2014-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-06-26 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-19 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-29 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Filed |