NC H1219 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-02 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-02 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Express Gratitude to Members for Their Service
Title
Express Gratitude to Members for Their Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - R2 For Adopt (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | Adopted | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-11 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-11 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-04 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-04 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-04 | Placed On Cal For 6/4/2012 | |
2012-06-04 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2012-06-04 | Filed | |
2012-06-04 | Reptd Fav. For Introduction |