NC H1176 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
Summary
Reorganize Schools with High Dropout Rate.
Title
Reorganize Schools with High Dropout Rate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Com Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-13 | Serial referral to Appropriations is stricken. | |
2009-04-08 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S424 (Same As) 2011-03-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1176 |