NC H1153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Iredell-Statesville Bd. of Ed/Election Method
Title
Iredell-Statesville Bd. of Ed/Election Method
Sponsors
Rep. John Fraley [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2020-05-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/27/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-05-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2020-05-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-19 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Filed |