NC H1134 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-14 - Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-14 - Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Summary
Open Government Act.
Title
Open Government Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-14 | Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-07-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-13 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-09 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2009-07-09 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2009 | |
2009-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-08 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-04 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1134 |