NC H1130 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Pledge to Uphold the Bill of Rights
Title
Pledge to Uphold the Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Michael Speciale [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
Rep. John Blust [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2016-06-20 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016 |
2016-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-19 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-18 | House | Filed |