NC H1126 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Red Light Cameras/City of Greenville
Title
Red Light Cameras/City of Greenville
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-64 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-06 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2016 |
2016-06-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-17 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2016-05-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S877 (Same As) 2016-05-18 - Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II