NC H1114 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Ch. SL 2014-69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Ch. SL 2014-69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elk Park/Deed Transferring Property
Title
Elk Park/Deed Transferring Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Ch. SL 2014-69 | |
2014-07-16 | Ratified | |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-19 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2014-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Filed |