NC H1110 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ten-Ten Fire District Governance
Title
Ten-Ten Fire District Governance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 10 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-12-06 - House - A3 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Motion 12 Add to Calendar (Y: 62 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A1 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A2 Holley Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 58 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 52 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-12-06 - House - M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 10 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-12-06 - House - A3 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Motion 12 Add to Calendar (Y: 62 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A1 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A2 Holley Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 58 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 52 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-12-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-12-12 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/12/2018 |
2018-12-10 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-12-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/11/2018 |
2018-12-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-12-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/10/2018 |
2018-12-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2018-12-06 | House | Reconsidered 2nd Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-12-05 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-12-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-12-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2018-12-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-12-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-11-29 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Finance |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Filed |