NC H1106 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Apex Annexation
Title
Apex Annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Ch. SL 2012-109 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-21 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-14 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-24 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Filed |