NC H11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Regulate Alcohol Consumables

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulate Alcohol Consumables

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-05SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-05HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-01HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-31HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-31HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-03-31HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-31HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-30HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-10HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary 2
2021-03-10HouseRuled Material
2021-03-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-01-28HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-01-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-01-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18B101(n/a)Citation Text
18B206(n/a)Citation Text
18B804(n/a)Citation Text
18B805(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback