NC H1087 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Water/Wastewater Public Enterprise Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water/Wastewater Public Enterprise Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Ch. SL 2020-79
2020-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-26HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-26SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-26SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-25HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-23SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-22HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-22HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-22SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-22SenateEngrossed
2020-06-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A2
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-15SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2020-06-15SenateRegular Message Received From House
2020-06-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-11HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-09HousePlaced On Cal For 06/10/2020
2020-06-09HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-09HouseRuled Material
2020-06-09HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2020-06-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-03HouseRuled Material
2020-05-14HouseRef to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-05-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2020-05-14HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H1087
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1087v8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/943
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/957
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/771
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/770
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/769
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/794
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/998
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1057
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/876

Bill Comments

feedback