NC H1087 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Preserve Biological Evidence/Study
Title
Preserve Biological Evidence/Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2014-06-06 | House | Regular Message sent to the Senate |
2014-06-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/05/2014 |
2014-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-19 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2014-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Filed |