NC H1064 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ch. SL 2024-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ch. SL 2024-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Local Provisions III
Title
Various Local Provisions III
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Motion 11 To Divide (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Motion 11 To Divide (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Ch. SL 2024-14 | |
2024-06-27 | Ratified | |
2024-06-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-26 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2024-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2024 |
2024-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2024-06-25 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Amend Tabled A2 |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Motion to Divide Question Failed |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2024-06-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2024-06-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-05-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Abc Boards
Airport Authorities
Airports
Alcoholic Beverages
Authorities
Aviation
Bermuda Run
Bethania
Boards
Brunswick County
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
City Managers
Clemmons
Counties
Davie County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Extraterritoriality
Forsyth County
Iredell County
Jackson County
Jones County
Kernersville
Kindergarten
Lewisville
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Mayors
Mecklenburg County
Membership
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Planning & Zoning
Political Parties
Polk County
Property
Property-local Government
Public Officials
Railroads
Ratified
Rentals & Leasing
Rural Hall
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Southern Pines
Southport
Statesville
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Tobaccoville
Transportation
Vacancies
Walkertown
Winston-salem
Wrightsville Beach
Airport Authorities
Airports
Alcoholic Beverages
Authorities
Aviation
Bermuda Run
Bethania
Boards
Brunswick County
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
City Managers
Clemmons
Counties
Davie County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Extraterritoriality
Forsyth County
Iredell County
Jackson County
Jones County
Kernersville
Kindergarten
Lewisville
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Mayors
Mecklenburg County
Membership
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Planning & Zoning
Political Parties
Polk County
Property
Property-local Government
Public Officials
Railroads
Ratified
Rentals & Leasing
Rural Hall
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Southern Pines
Southport
Statesville
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Tobaccoville
Transportation
Vacancies
Walkertown
Winston-salem
Wrightsville Beach
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 37.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 158 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 240.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 272 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 292 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 805 | (n/a) | Citation Text |