NC H1057 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DENR Study IBT/EMC Eco Flow Study
Title
DENR Study IBT/EMC Eco Flow Study
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hager [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] |
Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A2 Daughtry Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A1 Baskerville Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A2 Daughtry Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A1 Baskerville Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-19 | House | Postponed To 06/24/2014 |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2014 |
2014-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-15 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S757 (Same As) 2014-05-15 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources