NC H1051 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize DHHS/Cooperative Extension Contract
Title
Authorize DHHS/Cooperative Extension Contract
Sponsors
Rep. James Whitmire [R] | Rep. Edgar Starnes [R] | Rep. Yvonne Holley [D] | Rep. James Fulghum [R] |
Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A1 Whitmire Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A1 Whitmire Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2014 |
2014-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Government |
2014-06-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-05-15 | House | Ref To Com On Agriculture |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Filed |