NC H1035 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
LGC/Training for Local Gov't Finance Officers
Title
LGC/Training for Local Gov't Finance Officers
Sponsors
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Linda Johnson [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] |
Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-84 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Ratified | |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-14 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016 |
2016-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-05 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-03 | House | Filed |