NC H1033 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ch. SL 2014-89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ch. SL 2014-89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special Assessment/Dam Repair
Title
Special Assessment/Dam Repair
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Ch. SL 2014-89 | |
2014-07-30 | Signed by Gov. 7/30/2014 | |
2014-07-22 | Pres. To Gov. 7/22/2014 | |
2014-07-21 | Ratified | |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2014 |
2014-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2014 |
2014-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-18 | House | Ruled Material |
2014-06-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S766 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance