NC H1027 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DWI Interlock Violation/DMV Hearing Site
Title
DWI Interlock Violation/DMV Hearing Site
Sponsors
Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Darren Jackson [D] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Michael Speciale [R] | Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2014 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2014 |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2014-05-30 | House | Regular Message sent to the Senate |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/29/2014 |
2014-05-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-15 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S830 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II