NC H1022 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Ch. SL 2016-48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Ch. SL 2016-48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Maxton Deannex/Siler City Satellite Annex
Title
Maxton Deannex/Siler City Satellite Annex
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Ch. SL 2016-48 | |
2016-06-29 | Ratified | |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016 |
2016-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-03 | House | Filed |