NC H1020 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-502
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-502
Summary
Cancer Patient Assistance.
Title
Cancer Patient Assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-502 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Ratified | |
2009-08-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Placed On Cal For 8/4/2009 | |
2009-08-03 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-07-29 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-07-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | |
2009-05-12 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-02 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1020 |