NC H1015 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Ch. SL 2013-354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Ch. SL 2013-354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bessemer City Annexation
Title
Bessemer City Annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | Ch. SL 2013-354 | |
2013-07-25 | Ratified | |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-07-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-07-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-18 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-06-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-06-17 | House | Filed |
2013-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav. For Introduction |