MT SR26 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Governor's appointee to the board of livestock
Title
Confirm Governor's appointee to the board of livestock
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-03-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-03-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-13 | Senate | (S) Resolution Adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |