MT SJ6 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution urging Regulation Freedom amendment to US constitution
Title
Resolution urging Regulation Freedom amendment to US constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-02-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-01-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-11-28 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-28 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-10-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |