MT SJ3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study on optional septic drain fields
Title
Interim study on optional septic drain fields
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Conference |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Local Government |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Local Government |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Local Government |
2019-02-06 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Local Government |
2019-02-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-20 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-10-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |