MT SJ3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study of tribal resources for mbrs involved in criminal justice system
Title
Interim study of tribal resources for mbrs involved in criminal justice system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2017-01-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2016-12-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2016-12-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2016-11-28 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-11-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-11-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |