MT SJ23 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study gas pricing in Montana
Title
Study gas pricing in Montana
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-03-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-03-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-03-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-03-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-03-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-03-16 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=23&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SJ&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/senjoint/SJ0023_1.pdf |