MT SJ18 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study light detection and ranging data
Title
Study light detection and ranging data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |