MT SB96 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the controlled allocation of liability laws
Title
Revise the controlled allocation of liability laws
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-03-16 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-14 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-09 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-31 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-31 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-01-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-01-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2014-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-11-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-11-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2014-11-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-11-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-09-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |