MT SB91 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require fiscal notes to include business impact
Title
Require fiscal notes to include business impact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-26 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2021-03-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2021-03-11 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-03-09 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-03-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-11 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-01-14 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-01-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-01-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-08 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-10-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |