MT SB87 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise campaign finance report laws
Title
Revise campaign finance report laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2017-01-25 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-01-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-01-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-01-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=87&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/sb0099/SB0087_1.pdf |