MT SB81 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Include prepaid wireless in 9-1-1 tax
Title
Include prepaid wireless in 9-1-1 tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-10 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2021-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-02 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2021-01-21 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2021-01-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2021-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-06 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-13 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |