MT SB62 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certification for behavioral health peer support specialists
Title
Certification for behavioral health peer support specialists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-17 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2017-03-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Human Services |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Human Services |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Human Services |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Human Services |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2017-01-18 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-01-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-01-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-01-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2016-12-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2016-12-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2016-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-10-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |