MT SB560 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the Defend the Montana Guard Act
Title
Establish the Defend the Montana Guard Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Fuller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-31 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-30 | (C) Legal Review Note | |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) State Administration |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-03-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-03-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-20 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |