MT SB510 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide property tax incentives for alternative fuel production
Title
Provide property tax incentives for alternative fuel production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-05 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-05-04 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-05-04 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-05-01 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-21 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-21 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2023-04-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-04-03 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-30 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2023-03-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2023-03-20 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-03-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-17 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-16 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2023-03-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-03-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |