MT SB487 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise motor vehicle laws
Title
Generally revise motor vehicle laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-22 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2023-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Transportation |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2023-03-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-03-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2023-03-14 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process |
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-01 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-02-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-13 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-12-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |