MT SB48 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing transfer of certain highway funding to tribes
Title
Allowing transfer of certain highway funding to tribes
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Fox [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-01-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2020-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-10-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-08-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=48&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/SB0099/SB0048_1.pdf |