MT SB450 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Personal Freedom /Right of Conscience Act related to immunizations and drugs
Title
Personal Freedom /Right of Conscience Act related to immunizations and drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - (H) Motion Failed (Y: 42 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2023-04-13 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-03 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-03-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-21 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-21 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Discrimination and Human Rights
Health
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Minors
Schools and Education
State Government
Health
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Minors
Schools and Education
State Government