MT SB416 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Motion Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Motion Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for statewide infrastructure.
Title
Provide for statewide infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-25 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2015-04-27 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2015-04-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2015-04-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-03-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-03-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-03-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-03-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-11-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |