MT SB358 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal numeric nutrient standards for water quality
Title
Repeal numeric nutrient standards for water quality
Sponsors
Sen. John Esp [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-07 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2021-04-01 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-11-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |