MT SB355 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require net neutrality

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require net neutrality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25Senate(S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-04-01Senate(S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
2019-03-28Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-03-28Senate(S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-03-25Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-03-25Senate(S) First Reading
2019-03-23 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2019-03-23Senate(S) Introduced
2019-03-23 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2019-03-21 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2019-03-21 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2019-03-21 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2019-03-20 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2019-03-20 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2019-03-20 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2019-02-20 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2019-02-19 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2019-02-19 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2019-02-19 (C) Draft in Assembly
2019-02-19 (C) Executive Director Review
2019-02-19 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2019-02-19 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2019-02-18 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2019-02-18 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2019-02-18 (C) Draft in Edit
2019-02-18 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2019-02-15 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2019-01-07 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback