MT SB347 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise water degradation laws
Title
Revise water degradation laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2013-05-10 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2013-05-03 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2013-05-03 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | (C) Special Note | |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2013-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-11 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |