MT SB346 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require Dept of Revenue to provide certain information on website
Title
Require Dept of Revenue to provide certain information on website
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Lake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-02-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=346&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/sb0399/SB0346_1.pdf |