MT SB342 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise bicycle law
Title
Revise bicycle law
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2023-02-20 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2023-02-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-06 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2022-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |